THE ABCD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NOTE FOR POTENTIAL APPLICANTS: THIS CHARITY DOES NOT ACCEPT UNSOLICITED APPLICATIONS. ITS FUNDS ARE PRIMARILY APPLIED IN FUNDING EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS IN BRAZIL DEVOTED TO DEALING WITH DYSLEXIA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Brazil
- United States
Governance
- 26 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hendrik Guillaume Francois van Riel | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aldo Laurence Maria Coronelli | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marcela de Castro Bastos | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean-Louis de Montesquiou | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Louis De Camaret | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN VOS | Trustee |
|
||||||
PATRICE DE CAMARET | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.99k | £51.45k | £43.76k | £18.11k | £26.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £693.92k | £2.28m | £462.27k | £857.47k | £388.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO THE FOLLOWING PROVISIONS, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
MACFARLANES LLP
20 CURSITOR STREET
LONDON
EC4A 1LT
- Phone:
- 02078319222
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window