Financial history TELFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1134372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £282.01k £283.46k £287.85k £649.62k £688.52k
Total expenditure £385.47k £318.73k £337.18k £283.81k £557.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £200 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £1 £14.18k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £240.33k £231.97k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £24.81k £51.69k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £384.28k £390.68k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £281.42k £554.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £2.39k £2.98k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0