THE METHODIST CHURCH, WALSALL CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As set out in the Methodist Church Act 1976 clause 4 ??? synopsis The advancement of religion and any charitable purpose of the Methodist Church or Church organisation. ??? Religious activities for the benefit of the General public / Mankind By ??? Provides buildings / facilities / open space ??? Other charitable activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sandwell
- Walsall
Governance
- 19 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jeremy Hawkins Super | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norma Cleopathro Bryan | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lynda Denise Yeadon | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Howells | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Jane Flukes | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Peter Morris Glover | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Ndoho | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janice Cox | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Reilly | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Gibbons | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
William Alan Wilkes | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Barry Gibbons | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
MRS GILL JOLLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN OWEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.87k | £165.27k | £386.28k | £133.85k | £120.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.14k | £173.04k | £258.06k | £171.66k | £180.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 PARK ROAD
WALSALL
WS5 3JU
- Phone:
- 01213571856
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window