LISKEARD AND LOOE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Liskeard & Looe Circuit exists to provide oversight and administrative support to 9 Methodist churches within its boundary enabling them to share the love of God by word and action in their local communities. Provides pastoral care and a preaching plan for ministers, local preachers. Supervises the maintenance of churches and manses in the circuit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £11,250 from 1 government contract(s)
People

30 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
Governance
- 18 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glenn Roger Peters | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev LORAINE NANCY MELLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Jeanette Simmonds | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan I Chenoweth | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Beeke | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela May Searle | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Courtiour-Nicholson | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Dawn Pickard | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARK RICHARD WIGLEY | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HODGKINSON | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Joan Rowe | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janina Waterman | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Waterman | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Keast | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Margaret Cole | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Julia Gilbert | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barry Hocking | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Doris Taylor | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Worth | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Rowe | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ann Barnicoat | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
WENDY BARBERY | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER HAZEL ROOSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS LIZ WIGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA SHIRLEY TAMBLYN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE HUSK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS BIDDY BISHOP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES HUSK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JOHN COLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY JEANNETTE JORY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £183.09k | £133.41k | £388.58k | £146.24k | £147.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.62k | £210.16k | £261.06k | £186.04k | £141.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.25k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Liskeard Methodist Church
Barn Street
LISKEARD
Cornwall
PL14 4BL
- Phone:
- 01579347382
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window