Financial history FOODCYCLE

Charity Number: 1134423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.60m £1.26m £1.85m £2.76m £2.00m
Total expenditure £948.14k £1.33m £1.70m £2.33m £2.61m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £700 N/A N/A £83.41k £6.48k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.57m £1.23m £1.82m £2.57m £1.80m
Income - Other trading activities £25.71k £27.48k £28.77k £64.82k £36.73k
Income - Charitable activities £3.91k £5.02k £4.97k £88.78k £116.02k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.66k £604 £2.14k £36.86k £46.57k
Income - Other £0 £895 £34 £3.04k £3.45k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £823.11k £1.13m £1.47m £2.01m £2.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £125.03k £193.91k £224.72k £318.03k £357.00k
Expenditure - Governance £10.51k £13.19k £22.65k £23.73k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0