Accounts and annual returns THE STEPHEN BELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1135367
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 05 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 11 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 03 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 21 September 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required