Financial history THE STEPHEN BELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1135367
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £2.89k £3.94k £3.73k £596 £468
Total expenditure £19.42k £39.21k £30.18k £40.80k £89.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A