THE WCSM EDUCATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance study, knowledge and education in the field of optics including support for optical training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 March 2010: Standard registration
- 16 September 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 16 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1186122 THE SPECTACLE MAKERS' CHARITY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.77k | £44.37k | £55.96k | £45.61k | £45.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.63k | £48.79k | £36.24k | £48.65k | £48.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 28 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 20 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 20 November 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE STUDY, KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF OPTICS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (AND PARTICULARLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED) INCLUDING BY BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A THE FUNDING OF LECTURES AND THE PUBLICATION OF THESE IN THE NAME OF THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF SPECTACLE MAKERS TO PROMOTE AWARENESS OF THE FIELD OF OPTICS TO THE PUBLIC AND TO FOSTER GREATER SHARING IN THE FIELD OF OPTICS; B DEVELOPING AND CONDUCTING TRAINING COURSES FOR THOSE INVOLVED IN THE FIELD OF OPTICS; C THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF EXAMINATIONS IN THE FIELD OF OPTICS ON BEHALF OF THE AWARDING BODY, THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF SPECTACLE MAKERS; D CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS, MAINTAINING OR INSTITUTING RESEARCH , RESEARCH FELLOWSHIPS, GRANTS OR SCHOLARSHIPS IN THE FIELD OF OPTICS; AND E SUPPORTING THE ACTIVITIES OF THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF SPECTACLE MAKERS IN ANY OTHER WAY SO FAR AS THAT SUPPORT IS CHARITABLE AND COMPATIBLE WITH THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS AS SET OUT IN THIS ARTICLE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window