THE LEYLAND SOCIETY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the company/charity are: 1 - To advance the education of the public in relation to the historic development of road transport with particular reference to Leyland Motors Ltd. and its associated companies, and 2 - For the benefit of the public, to promote and encourage access to archive material and the preservation thereof.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Lukey | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|||||
JOHN HENRY ORMISTON | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gary Dwyer | Trustee | 06 December 2005 |
|
|
||||
DONALD EDWARD HILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HOWIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GARY WILLIAM DWYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.73k | £19.75k | £23.01k | £21.96k | £18.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.18k | £20.72k | £30.31k | £20.68k | £20.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
OBJECT 1: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO THE HISTORIC DEVELOPMENT OF ROAD TRANSPORT AND IN PARTICULAR THE HISTORY OF LEYLAND MOTORS LIMITED AND ITS ASSOCIATED COMPANIES, INCLUDING ITS PRODUCTS, STAFF, PREMISES AND ITS SOCIAL IMPACT THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. THIS WAS A BRITISH COMPANY THAT WAS ONCE THE FIFTH LARGEST MANUFACTURER OF COMMERCIAL VEHICLES IN THE WORLD AND WHICH HAD A COLOSSAL IMPACT ON THE ECONOMIC PROSPERITY OF GREAT BRITAIN IN THE TWENTIETH CENTURY. OBJECT 2: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE ACCESS TO ARCHIVE MATERIAL, RELICS AND HISTORIC ROAD VEHICLES AND TO ENCOURAGE THE PROTECTION, RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION OF ALL RELATED HISTORICAL RELICS AND MATERIAL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
213 Castle Hill Road
Totternhoe
Dunstable
LU6 2DA
- Phone:
- 01525221676
- Email:
- info@leylandsociety.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window