THE FOUNDATION FOR LIVER RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research comprises 7 main areas:- Viral Hepatitis; Liver Inflammation & Metabolism; Metabolic Profiling; Mitochondrial Dysfunction; Liver Regeneration & Repair; Alcohol; Senescence & the liver. The Institute of Hepatology is affiliated to Birkbeck, University of London & a Memo of Understanding has been signed with King's College London & King's College Hospital NHS Trust for future collaborations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£3,333,944
Donations and legacies | £524.62k | |
Charitable activities | £458.19k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £2.35m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,523,495
Raising funds | £380.97k | |
Charitable activities | £3.14m | |
Other | £0 |
-£792,222 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £380.97k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.14m |
People

27 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 March 2010: Standard registration
- 01 May 2024: Funds received from 268211 THE FOUNDATION FOR LIVER RESEARCH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Christopher Day | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Anna Bennett | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Rebecca Fitzgerald | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Charles Hopkinson-Woolley | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Wainwright | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sir Ian Gilmore | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ALAN MCGREGOR | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SIR JEREMY VERNON ELWES CBE FRSA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COL HAMON MASSEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.30m | £2.82m | £2.78m | £3.02m | £3.33m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.69m | £2.64m | £2.84m | £3.25m | £3.52m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.17m | £30.35k | £119.09k | £740.92k | £524.62k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £252.50k | £112.60k | £0 | £458.19k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.13m | £2.16m | £2.22m | £2.27m | £2.35m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £378.63k | £331.76k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £125.24k | £3.69k | £6.87k | £77.19k | £57.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.40m | £2.42m | £2.63m | £3.08m | £3.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £285.68k | £222.31k | £205.10k | £174.45k | £380.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £55.86k | £53.27k | £63.24k | £111.34k | £132.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £40.00k | £40.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £285.68k | £222.31k | £30.75k | £174.45k | £48.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.82m | £5.52m | £6.78m | £6.55m | £6.35m | |
|
Long-term investments | £39.69m | £42.05m | £41.27m | £39.69m | £38.87m | |
|
Other assets | £5.79m | £5.37m | £5.73m | £5.64m | £5.70m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.06m | £1.03m | £1.15m | £1.02m | £1.03m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
A THE FURTHERANCE OR BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITIES, CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, AND IF MORE THAN ONE, IN SUCH SHARES AND MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT B IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO DEVELOP AND EXTEND RESEARCH INTO THE HUMAN LIVER AND ITS DISEASES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Roger Williams Institute of Hepatology
111 Coldharbour Lane
LONDON
LONDON
London
SE5 9NT
- Phone:
- 02072559830
- Email:
- n.day@researchinliver.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window