THE SENECA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty & enrich the lives of people in need by promoting health, welfare & the advancement of education. To carry on for the benefit of the community the pursuit of providing housing & any associated amenities for persons in necessitous circumstances. These will be achieved through direct assistance and/or by providing grants to charities or other organizations and/or individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,246,573
Donations and legacies | £3.13m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £112.40k |
Total expenditure:
£2,759,917
Raising funds | £102.95k | |
Charitable activities | £2.66m | |
Other | £0 |
-£61,770 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £102.95k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.66m | |
Retained for future use | £486.66k |
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Gundle | Chair | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Edwards | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ruth Gundle | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE WADE | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ADAM DAVID SWEIDAN | Trustee | 02 July 2010 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £399.78k | £544.30k | £1.01m | £2.76m | £3.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £196.30k | £433.07k | £674.57k | £944.73k | £2.76m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £479.29k | £947.61k | £2.64m | £3.13m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £43.85k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £65.01k | £66.58k | £122.58k | £112.40k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £947.61k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £413.22k | £662.28k | £921.15k | £2.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £19.85k | £12.30k | £23.58k | £102.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £659.61k | £918.26k | £2.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £1.09m | £1.09m | £1.09m | £1.09m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £568.70k | £758.12k | £2.14m | £3.69m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £132.29k | £482.81k | £1.18m | £1.04m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £11.73k | £168.20k | £275.13k | £1.25m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 06/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND NEED, PROMOTE HEALTH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON PEOPLE WHO HAVE A DISABILITY OR SUFFER FROM SICKNESS OR LACK OF EDUCATION. TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE PURSUIT OF PROVIDING HOUSING (BY CONSTRUCTION OR CONVERSION) AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR DISABLED PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF DISPLACED PEOPLE AND REFUGEES BY PROVIDING ADVICE ON NUTRITION, SANITATION, HEALTH AND PSYCHO-SOCIAL SUPPORT AND ANY OTHER NECESSARY MEASURES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE SENECA TRUST WILL ACCOMPLISH THESE OBJECTIVES BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS OR INDIVIDUALS IN THE UK OR INTERNATIONALLY, IDENTIFIED BY THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR DISCRETION
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
IXWORTH HOUSE
37 IXWORTH PLACE
LONDON
SW3 3QH
- Phone:
- 02075898899
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window