Accounts and annual returns ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1136791
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 317 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 317 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 683 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 683 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1048 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1048 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 March 2020 On Time