THE KENDRAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furtherance of the Christian faith in Kendray specifically by supporting a youth worker and a woman and childrens worker.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 13 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND PETER CHARLES WILLIAM JACKSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Meredith Amanda Bradshaw | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN WATTS | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Zacc Marshall Salisbury | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jacob | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA JANE CLOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.41k | £143.05k | £133.66k | £136.65k | £138.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.20k | £83.96k | £95.75k | £113.02k | £100.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN BARNSLEY, SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
BARNSLEY, SOUTH YORKSHIRE, THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Old Oaks View
BARNSLEY
S70 3RN
- Phone:
- 07939517072
- Email:
- thecloughies22@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window