BRITISH PAKISTAN FOUNDATION FOR DEVELOPMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To engage, unite, and empower the UK's more than 1.5 million British Pakistanis, by bringing them together, giving them a voice, and supporting their socio-economic development through a platform that serves and protects the best interests of the British Pakistani community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 01 September 2010: Standard registration
- BPF (Working name)
- BRITISH PAKISTAN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AHSON TORU | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Dr Shahid Latif | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Marium Qaiser | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Faria Harooj Ali | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
ZAHRA SHAH | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||
ASIF RANGOONWALA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.94k | £92.40k | £80.98k | £60.82k | £95.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.89k | £92.62k | £71.88k | £92.55k | £68.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2024 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2024 | 205 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 December 2020 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 December 2020 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ENTERED ON COMPANIES REGISTER 21 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (A) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN PAKISTAN AND IN THE BRITISH PAKISTANI COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; (B) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PEOPLE OF PAKISTAN AND IN THE BRITISH PAKISTANI COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE AND IN OTHER SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; (C) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN PAKISTAN AND IN THE BRITISH PAKISTANI COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY: (I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; AND (II) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS" (D) TO PROMOTE RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY, INCLUDING BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN THE PEOPLES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, PAKISTAN AND OTHER COUNTRIES OF THE WORLD; (E) TO IMPROVE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN PAKISTAN; AND (F) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FOR TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN AND IN THE BRITISH PAKISTANI COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUEEN ANNE MANSIONS
86-87 Wimpole Street
London
W1G 9RL
- Phone:
- 02079358890
- Email:
- info@bpfuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window