INTERNATIONAL AIR CADET TRAINING

Charity number: 1138729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

IACT focuses on engaging with potential partner nations to explain the benefits that the Air Cadet experience can provide for developing their own youth. In explaining the benefits of Air Cadets we have regard to the Charity Commission's general guidance on public benefit and the development of young people as positive, engaged and contributing citizens for the public benefit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £118

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Albania
  • Guyana
  • Kenya
  • Tanzania

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 November 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AIR COMMODORE RICK PEACOCK-EDWARDS Chair 27 June 2012
None on record
Air Marshal Sir Christopher Charles Cotton Coville KCB Trustee 17 March 2023
CRANWELLIAN ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE YEATMAN HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Air Commodore Ian Stewart CBE Trustee 17 March 2023
None on record
LORD HUTTON OF FURNESS PC Trustee
ANIMAL REFUGE FURNESS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £118 £118 £118
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 31 July 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 31 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 August 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
31 Ashbee Gardens
HERNE BAY
CT6 6TX
Phone:
07884495645