BRAMPFORD SPEKE VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running the village hall for the benefit of local residents: for meetings, classes, leisure activities etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 14 January 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jon Machell | Chair | 28 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD TILLETT | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAT BRAZIL | Trustee | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAC MERRETT | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS M G LUXTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID JOHN BAMFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARGARET SATCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.92k | £3.32k | £7.15k | £5.39k | £4.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.98k | £2.78k | £3.51k | £7.42k | £3.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BRAMPFORD SPEKE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BRAMPFORD SPEKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHAMBERLAINS COTTAGE
BRAMPFORD SPEKE
EXETER
EX5 5DR
- Phone:
- 01392841731
- Email:
- penny@apwiles.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window