Financial history CHRIST CHURCH, EXMOUTH

Charity number: 1141732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £112.58k £109.11k £102.85k £102.98k £98.17k
Total expenditure £75.34k £82.62k £87.02k £97.69k £97.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £706 N/A N/A N/A