CHRIST CHURCH, EXMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting activities which further the vision of Christ Church Exmouth which is "living and sharing God's amazing love". The church is run by its members and seeks to add value to the local community and beyond by outworking the Christian Faith in diverse ways. The work includes children and youth activities, weekly Life Groups, prayer meetings, pastoral support, and Sunday Services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Somerset
- Spain
Governance
- 05 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Edmund Nowaczyk | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Ralli | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Lorraine Tait | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Lowrie | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Pike | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.58k | £109.11k | £102.85k | £102.98k | £98.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.34k | £82.62k | £87.02k | £97.69k | £97.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £706 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 November 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 November 2021 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN UNION WITH AND ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OTHERWISE CALLED THE REFORMED EPISCOPAL CHURCH CONTAINED WITHIN THE DECLARATION OF PRINCIPLES AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1
Area of benefit
EAST DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church
29 North Street
EXMOUTH
EX8 1JZ
- Phone:
- 07553 115904
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window