HIAS+JCORE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education: Race Equality education in youth groups and schools. Refugee and Asylum: Refugee Doctors Mentoring Project, JCORE Support 'gifts in kind' project and JUMP project helping unaccompanied asylum seeking children and young people. Dialogue: Black-Asian-Jewish alliance. Previously The Jewish Council for Racial Equality (JCORE). Reg: 281236.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 November 2009: Standard registration
- 01 December 2011: Funds received from 281236 THE JEWISH COUNCIL FOR RACIAL EQUALITY (JCORE)
- JCORE (Working name)
- JEWISH COUNCIL FOR RACIAL EQUALITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Flacks | Chair | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Rosenberg | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alba Kapoor | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ashley | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Hyman | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Russell Cohen | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marisa Cohen | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Katznelson | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Levitan | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Heller | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Thompson | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.61k | £149.44k | £175.90k | £92.85k | £274.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.39k | £121.82k | £139.71k | £154.13k | £282.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 29 SEPTEMBER 2009 as amended on 17 Sep 2019 as amended on 01 Sep 2021 as amended on 12 Jul 2023 as amended on 13 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (C) SUPPORTING LEARNING IN BOTH FORMAL AND INFORMAL SECTORS, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, SYNAGOGUES, AND JEWISH COMMUNAL ORGANISATIONS, TO SPREAD AN AWARENESS OF COMMUNITY AND RACE RELATIONS ISSUES THROUGHOUT THE JEWISH COMMUNITY; (D) ENCOURAGING THE COMMITMENT OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY TO THESE OBJECTS AND STIMULATING ITS ACTIVE INVOLVEMENT IN THEIR PURSUIT. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN RELATION TO ISSUES OF RACIAL EQUALITY. 3. THE RELIEF OF NEED FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST ASYLUM SEEKERS AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL SKILLS AND TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ANY OTHER RELEVANT MEANS APPROPRIATE FOR THAT PURPOSE THAT MAY APPLY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 47864
LONDON
NW11 1AB
- Phone:
- 02084550896
- Email:
- admin@hiasjcore.org
- Website:
-
hiasjcore.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window