THE SIOBHAN DOWD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant giving
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY BRADMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
John Theis | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Jessica Eccleshare | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|||||||
HILARY ANN DELAMERE | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Lady Rachel Billington | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.26k | £75.68k | £63.73k | £61.35k | £62.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.39k | £62.06k | £83.20k | £97.46k | £39.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 April 2025 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 23 April 2025 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 308 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 308 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 October 2023 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 October 2023 | 244 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 May 2022 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 08 May 2022 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL 31 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ANY CHILD OR TO CHILDREN WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN YEARS AND WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL OR OTHER NEED AND WHO LIVE IN ENGLAND AND WALES TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT BY ASSISTING SUCH CHILD OR SUCH CHILDREN IN RELATION TO THEIR READING AND FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
6b Lee Terrace
Blackheath
London
SE3 9TX
- Phone:
- 07812 130863
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window