THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, KENILWORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship. Providing sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, teaching of Christianity, religious assemblies in schools. Provision of youth activities. Promoting Christianity and the mission of the church through activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers, children and youth and other special need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
105 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 23 October 2008: Previously excepted registration
- 03 February 2022: Funds received from 1099824 THE KING'S TABLE (KENILWORTH)
- ST JOHN'S PCC, KENILWORTH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANDREW MICHAEL ATTWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew George King | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr KALWANT RAI | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Ruth Perkins | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Homes | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
peter jackson | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Julie Sewards | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Kimberley Matthews | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Sewards MA, FIOD | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Luke Coomber | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVE COOMBER | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £355.79k | £308.80k | £438.18k | £284.89k | £295.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £297.61k | £254.56k | £254.72k | £228.58k | £214.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. John the Evangelist Church
205 Warwick Road
Kenilworth
CV8 1HY
- Phone:
- 01926 853203
- Email:
- admin@stjohn316.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window