Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY WITH SAINT MARY

Charity Number: 1128313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £403.69k £278.70k £368.37k £400.34k £440.43k
Total expenditure £785.89k £276.89k £413.84k £433.76k £453.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £91.63k N/A N/A N/A N/A