Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY WITH SAINT MARY
Charity Number: 1128313

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Canon Simon Butler | Chair | 09 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew Clifford Jobson | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Thomas Alexander Thorp | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Clare Marren | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Brown | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen John Bampfylde | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Janet Eileen Hancock | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
William Nigel Campion-Smith | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Mark Boor | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Virginia Gregory | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Josephine Leak | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Charles Percy Crockford Howes | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennifer Nockolds | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Graham | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Christopher Roberts | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Rosemary Lee | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
VENETIA HOWES | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Martin Kettell | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Grayson Jones | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Nicola Amanda Matthews | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Carolyn Jane Graham | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Jane Catherine Hedgecock BSC ARCS | Trustee | 23 June 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Alwyn Marriage | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Rev Jonathan James Hedgecock MIET, ACGI | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.