HASTINGS SIERRA LEONE FRIENDSHIP LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hastings Sierra Leone Friendship Link was founded in 2003 to help Hastings SL to recover from the devastation it suffered during the Rebel War, and to build a relationship between Hastings UK and Hastings SL. The Link carries out regeneration projects in the village; supports links between community groups and schools; and plans projects in the areas of health and economic regeneration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 10 December 2008: Standard registration
- HSLFL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Graham Homewood | Chair | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Jason Morton | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Lewis Leslie Arthur Boorman | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Isabel Hodger | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Martin John Copland | Trustee | 27 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Lynn Elizabeth White | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|||||||
Christine Boulton-Lane | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Roger James MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DEREK TOMBLIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROBIN GRAY MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.30k | £7.43k | £12.54k | £13.06k | £16.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.93k | £12.64k | £30.74k | £7.42k | £9.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED 3 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE CITIZENS OF HASTINGS, SIERRA LEONE AND SURROUNDING AREA BY 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING 2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS 3 THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH 4 THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON ALL ASPECTS OF LOCAL SIERRA LEONEAN HISTORY AND CULTURE
Area of benefit
HASTINGS, SIERRA LEONE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAKLANDS
ROCK LANE
HASTINGS
TN35 4NY
- Phone:
- 01424436603
- Email:
- secretary.hslfl@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window