EMMANUEL EVANGELICAL CHURCH CHIPPENHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly public Sunday services. Midweek meetings including activities for children, young people and older adults. Providing support to carers of young children, elderly or infirm adults and ad hoc outreach events for the local community. Providing leaders / teachers for church services in smaller local churches, leaders for school assemblies and financial support for other Christian charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 29 October 2008: Previously excepted registration
- EECC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Taylor | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Court | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.60k | £157.87k | £189.00k | £150.65k | £183.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.63k | £161.75k | £154.27k | £157.32k | £167.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2024 | 355 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2024 | 355 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 19 OCT 2008
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN CHIPPENHAM AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF [THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH IN GENERAL MEETING THE MANAGING TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
CHIPPENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmanuel Evangelical Church
Goldney Avenue
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN15 1ND
- Phone:
- 01249 460481
- Email:
- info@emmanuelecc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window