THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EPPING

Charity Number: 1128001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of a sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £244,106
Total expenditure: £184,099

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • EPPING, ST JOHN'S CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Phillis Njuguna Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Alexander Theodorou Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Rev John Fry Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
SARA MCLEAN Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Dr Natalie Kelberman Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Amanda Theodorou Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Maria Surnam Trustee 28 April 2025
None on record
Marian Rose Winters Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Rev Jessica Mary Bostock Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
David Manfred Gerard Siebler Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Shereen Louise Nimmo Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Jill Brant Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
JANET HILDA WHITEHOUSE BSC HONS Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Jo Patricia Waller Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
JANE MARION AGNEW Trustee 10 May 2013
None on record
NICHOLAS DWAYNE WOLD Trustee
EPPING FOREST HOUSING AID SCHEME
Received: On time
EPPING FOREST HOUSING AID SCHEME
Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days
Diana Margaret Lowry Trustee
EPPING FOREST DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
THE EPPING SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £189.67k £160.33k £182.44k £171.23k £244.11k
Total expenditure £186.94k £157.01k £226.16k £168.45k £184.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 November 2023 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 November 2023 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 November 2023 755 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 November 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 November 2020 7 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Johns House
St. Johns Road
EPPING
Essex
cm16 5dn
Phone:
01992 561517