THE METHODIST CHURCH - CLEVELAND AND DANBY CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The management and planning of regular public acts of worship within the churches in the circuit. The provision of ministers to undertake the teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. The provision of ministers to undertake pastoral work, visiting sick & behreaved, local industry & commercial premises. The conducting of marriages, funerals and christenings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

45 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 30 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
45 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Victor Sharples | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Delia Elizabeth Liddle | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Pauline Anne Drew | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Watson | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Dacey | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WELLS | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Eva Sykes | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Molly Thwaites | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Betty Bell | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Clayton | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Stenson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina McMahon | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin McLachlan | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yuonne Holden | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Dixon | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Denise Burdon | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kevin Highfield | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Jason Griffiths | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Sheila Crossman | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Sarah Louise Dixon | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Middlemiss | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Darby | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judith Hathaway | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Isabel Ann Stuart | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Beryl Irene Hurren | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Harrison | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Janet Coles | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Pearson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Chester | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Stephenson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV KEITH WILLIAM MARTIN | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Taylor | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Jonathan Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN PEARSON | Trustee | 28 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
ENA HARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT EDWARD NEWLOVE SHAWCROSS FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN SIMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA ANN TANSLEY CERT.ED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN RICHMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAWRENCE ERNEST PEIRSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Chadwick | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANN SOUTHGATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV TREVOR HAIGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.92k | £230.92k | £190.77k | £183.04k | £222.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £282.64k | £254.96k | £255.30k | £212.44k | £291.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 August 2020 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 August 2020 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 Windermere Drive
Skelton-In-Cleveland
SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA
Cleveland
TS12 2WT
- Phone:
- 01287658441
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window