BRUNSWICK METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1128118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Brunswick Methodist Church is part of the Methodist Church of Great Britain. Our strap line is 'The Church at the heart of the city'. We are the successors to John Wesley's [founder of the Methodist Church] first purpose built Methodist Church, we work to bring about change in people through a love of Christ, we act with Christian social justice, teaching, preaching and being a place of refuge.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £224,081
Total expenditure: £227,092

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Gateshead
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City
  • North Tyneside
  • Northumberland
  • South Tyneside
  • Sunderland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 11 May 2011: Funds received from 259852 THE MARY ELEANOR WALKER FUND
  • 11 May 2011: Funds received from 259851 MRS EVELYN BELL BEQUEST
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • THE CHURCH IN THE HEART OF THE CITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Paul David Cleever-Thorpe BA Chair 01 September 2017
NEWCASTLE CITY CENTRE CHAPLAINCY
Received: On time
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Alison Mary Wilkinson BA MEd MA Trustee 01 September 2024
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
JESMOND STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
Howard Joseph Chapman BEd ACG Trustee 28 April 2024
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Evelyn Mary Timperley Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Deacon Gail Irene Morgan Trustee 01 September 2023
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Keith Ian Gilfillan JP Trustee 01 January 2022
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Hena Mookerji LLM, LLB Trustee 15 May 2020
None on record
Jean Mawer Trustee 12 May 2019
None on record
Robert Wylie Trustee 01 October 2018
WALKING WITH IN NORTH TYNESIDE
Received: On time
WALKING WITH IN NORTH TYNESIDE
Received: On time
SHEILA ELIZABETH CRODDEN Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
JAGATH SANDARUWAN BOMBUWALAGE Trustee 06 June 2012
None on record
JANE ATHERTON Trustee
None on record
RUTH ELIZABETH COLCLOUGH MSc Trustee
None on record
JOAN CHRISTINE KELSALL TEACH Cert Trustee
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
DAVID ALEXANDER STABLER ACIB CeMap Trustee
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £256.84k £204.91k £202.74k £240.53k £224.08k
Total expenditure £270.58k £246.59k £249.18k £241.50k £227.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.17k N/A N/A £2.84k £1.99k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 26 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 26 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 11 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 04 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 18 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
81 STAMFORDHAM ROAD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE5 3JN
Phone:
01912321692