DURHAM CITY METHODISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religous worship and associated activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

38 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 21 November 2008: Previously excepted registration
- ELVET METHODIST CHURCH, DURHAM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
38 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Edward Warne | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Campbell Best | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwynyth Purvis | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Niven | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA JOHNSON | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Rutherford | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Peter Bissell | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Firth | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Davidson | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Alan Purvis | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Portrey | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARION HART | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Lawson | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Margaret Phillips | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Lynda Susan Underwood | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Ainslie | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Ruth Charman | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Archer Squares | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
DEACON RUTH MARION LACKENBY | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
John Edward Gibson | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lily Mary Hogg | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Scott | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Trevor William Coburn | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MELVYN HIGHAM | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW PHILLIPS | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|||||
SUZANNE MEIN | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Beverley John Thompson | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE MARY LUCIA FIELDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATH TURNER CERT.ED. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE ELLEN DUNDEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE HILL HIGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOREEN LAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN ELIZABETH VIRGINIA BRADBROOK BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Penny Bissell LLB Hons | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN WALTER CHAMBERLAYNE MA | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN SCOTT | Trustee |
|
||||||
PAUL HARRISON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.98k | £98.52k | £103.01k | £235.01k | £241.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.55k | £98.09k | £105.64k | £253.13k | £201.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £900 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 October 2020 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
28 October 2020 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) as amended on 08 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
DURHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elvet Methodist Church
Old Elvet
DURHAM
DH1 3HL
- Phone:
- 0191 3847599
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window