THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN, LISKEARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC is required, as stated in the Parochial Church (Powers) Measure 1956, to co-operate with the Priest in Charge in promoting in the parish the whole mission of the church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has maintenance responsibilities for St Martin's Church and St Martin's Centre in Church Street, Liskeard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £27,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 24 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- LISKEARD PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark John Wade | Chair | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Allen | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Yabsley | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Sally Wiltshire | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony Richard Piper | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Peter Leswell | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Alexander Thompson | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynette June Rule | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Lee Arulvasagam | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Pryor | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Martin | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mick Chandler | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mills | Trustee | 04 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHERI STURGESS | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES STURGESS | Trustee | 12 March 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.09k | £328.53k | £331.56k | £361.47k | £358.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £253.75k | £365.77k | £345.97k | £334.53k | £339.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.25k | £13.11k | £12.88k | £600 | £27.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Martin's Church Centre
Church Street
Liskeard
Cornwall
PL14 3AQ
- Phone:
- 01579347411
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window