HUCCLECOTE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £1,805 from 1 government grant(s)
People

28 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 11 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Ann Yates | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Butler | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beth Julia Sweet | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Blake | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Lillian John | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Clarke | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Margaret Cooke | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
RONALD CHARLES KEASLEY | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Scott Matthew Dickens | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Pearman | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BERNIE BREWSTER | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sue Clarke | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Mary Edna Little | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS BREWSTER | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE LONG | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LORAINE SHAW | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ROBERTS | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kay Jenkins | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brychan Jenkins | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ANDREW LONG | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Rainbow BA | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WOODWARD | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|||||
ARNOLD KEITH EKE | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK DICKENS | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA BLAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER ANDREW SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH JANE JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.31k | £69.23k | £116.59k | £105.56k | £101.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.77k | £74.88k | £121.01k | £99.98k | £95.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £250 | N/A | £11.12k | £1.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 MAYFIELD DRIVE
HUCCLECOTE
GLOUCESTER
GL3 3DS
- Phone:
- 01452617357
- Email:
- info@hucclecotemc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window