THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ROMFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council (PCC) has the responsibility of co-operating with the Vicar of Romford in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church: pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Havering
Governance
- 03 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST EDWARD THE CONFESSOR, ROMFORD (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isaac Fitzpatrick Chung | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gambini | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Quinn | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Bates | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Sheppard | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Quinn | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judy Shofolahan | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Michael Perry | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Margaret Trew | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dean Michael Moran | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Olaniyan | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Dalgliesh | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Adedamola Aboaba | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Linda Mair Rees | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Card | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Sharp | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kathleen Arbon | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Hardy-van den Beld | Trustee | 22 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.72k | £465.10k | £175.78k | £197.58k | £212.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £291.85k | £281.41k | £213.01k | £229.36k | £203.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. EDWARDS PARISH OFFICE
CHURCH HOUSE
MARKET PLACE
ROMFORD
RM1 3AB
- Phone:
- 01708744973
- Email:
- office@stedwardsromford.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window