TRINITY-AT-BOWES METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide religious teaching and support to persons of the Methodist Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £6,124 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Enfield
- Haringey
Governance
- 18 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- TAB CENTRE PLUS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SAMUEL THURAIRAJAH | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Charles Dadey | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
MS Janer Campbell | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
GLADYS CHINGOKA | Trustee | 14 June 2011 |
|
|||||
JOYCE GUTHRIE F INS SRM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KOJO HAGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Susan Margaret Godfrey | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER GODFREY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lilla Hercules | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINA EILEEN ALLEN BA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.87k | £230.52k | £296.88k | £283.92k | £317.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.90k | £203.47k | £195.16k | £250.55k | £234.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.43k | £25.82k | £5.00k | £6.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trinity-At-Bowes Methodist Church
Palmerston Road
LONDON
N22 8RA
- Phone:
- 02088882797
- Email:
- admin@trinityatbowes.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window