THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAFFRON WALDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 27 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- THE PARISH OF SAFFRON WALDEN (Working name)
- THE PARISH OF SAFFRON WALDEN WITH WENDENS AMBO, LITTLEBURY, ASHDON AND HADSTOCK (Previous name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAFFRON WALDEN WITH WENDENS AMBO, LITTLEBURY, ASHDON AND HADSTOCK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jeremy Charles Trew | Chair | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivian Falk Ms | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Simon Potter | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
HELEN NASH | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Ella Harris | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Li | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shawn Martin | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Vernon Gildea | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Lillian Razzell | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Noel Starr | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ruth Caswell | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Catherine Brook | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Rose Nicholls | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNA LOUISE ARMSTRONG MARTIN | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marisa Baltrock | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER QUARTERMAIN KING | Trustee | 12 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ROBERT HASLER | Trustee | 10 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN HUGALL | Trustee | 10 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN O'NEILL | Trustee | 10 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MARY HASLER | Trustee | 10 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD FORD FREEMAN | Trustee | 10 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BIRCHALL | Trustee | 15 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS BRON FERLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £398.00k | £246.95k | £273.21k | £361.40k | £397.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £311.16k | £271.99k | £336.97k | £401.16k | £303.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES AS AMENDED ON 25 JANUARY 2012
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 BOROUGH LANE
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB11 4AG
- Phone:
- 01799500947
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window