THE MELVILLE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A games afternoon on Mondays. Lunches on Wednesday. Whist drive Wednesday afternoon. Coffee Friday mornings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,600 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 02 June 1970: Standard registration
- ALBRIGHTON DARBY AND JOAN CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Jane medlyn | Chair | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tammy Summers | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE BARBARA SHORT | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Illes | Trustee | 28 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Robert Lansley | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hilary Roy Webster | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Marguerite Webster | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.39k | £31.52k | £35.89k | £28.59k | £47.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.48k | £30.90k | £40.18k | £40.44k | £58.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
04 February 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MAY 1970 AS AMENDED 26 MARCH 1973 AND 13 MAY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR ELDERLY PERSONS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A LUNCHEON CLUB FOR SUCH PEOPLE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
CIVIL PARISH OF ALBRIGHTON IN SHROPSHIRE AND ITS IMMEDIATE ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 BOWLING GREEN LANE
ALBRIGHTON
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV7 3HL
- Phone:
- 01902373727
- Email:
- richard453@blueyonder.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window