THE ROYCE AND OAKHAM CHURCH ESTATES CHARITY

Charity number: 500119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The financial support of music in and assistance with the maintenance of the fabric of the Parish Church known as All Saints in the town of Oakham, Rutland.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £9,391
Total expenditure: £9,133

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 May 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHURCH ESTATE CHARITY (Previous name)
  • OAKHAM CHURCH ESTATE CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Geraldine Feehally Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Adam Lowe Trustee 26 June 2021
BRIGG'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
OAKHAM MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS OAKHAM
Received: On time
Rev Stephen Robert Griffiths Trustee 23 September 2018
LAUNDE ABBEY TRUST
Received: On time
Des Cook Trustee 04 March 2017
THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST AND OF ST ANNE IN OKEHAM
Received: On time
PETER KINAL Trustee
OAKHAM MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
Received: On time
JOHN TOMALIN Trustee
None on record
Simon Mark Nicholls Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS OAKHAM
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF RUTLAND TRUST FUND
Received: On time
RUTLAND HEALTHCARE SUPPORT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.82k £28.23k £9.02k £9.16k £9.39k
Total expenditure £6.95k £28.15k £8.87k £9.13k £9.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 10 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 STAMFORD ROAD
OAKHAM
LE15 6JA
Phone:
01572757191
Website:

No information available