THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, BIDDULPH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing facilities for public worship, pastoral care and spiritual, moral and intellectual development, both for its members and for anyone who wishes to benifit from what the Church offers. Promoting Christain values, and service by members of the Church and in and to their communities to the benifit of individuals and society as a whole.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 31 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
- 28 July 2020: Funds received from 510512 CHURCH HALL CONGLETON ROAD
- ST LAWRENCE'S BIDDULPH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver McGuiness | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Nesom | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Hayes | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jim Davies | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Warburton | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Booth | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Nesom | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Roebuck | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev LINDSAY JOAN CLOWES | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cathy White | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gareth Hallam | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Beech | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JILL ELIZABETH GOVER | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW SHUFFLEBOTHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.16k | £152.61k | £120.51k | £163.75k | £199.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.37k | £153.04k | £149.08k | £177.73k | £206.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. LAWRENCE CHURCH HALL
CONGLETON ROAD
BIDDULPH
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST8 7RG
- Phone:
- 01782513891
- Email:
- office@biddulphchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window