LEEDS SOUTH AND WEST METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1129529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a Methodist Circuit created in 1/9/2015 covering 23 Methodist churches (including 5 local ecumenical partnerships) across the western half of the Leeds Metropolitan area. We aim to continue our life of witness in accordance with the Our Calling Priorities set out by the Methodist Church: Worship, Learning and Caring, Service, and Evangelism.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity and another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 16 June 2016: Funds received from 1132833 LEEDS (WESLEY) METHODIST CIRCUIT
  • 23 August 2016: Funds received from 1160652 LEEDS SOUTH AND CENTRAL METHODIST CIRCUIT
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • LEEDS (HEADINGLEY AND WEST) CIRCUIT (Previous name)
  • LEEDS, HEADINGLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

61 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Joanne Lightowler Chair 04 September 2013
THE METHODIST CHURCH YORKSHIRE WEST DISTRICT
Received: 103 days late
John Rodney Strickland Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
Carol Patricia Hoyle Trustee 20 May 2024
HORSFORTH GROVE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Helen Raw Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Timothy Nicholls Trustee 29 January 2024
PROJECT BONHOEFFER
Received: On time
Paul Thompson Trustee 15 November 2023
HORSFORTH GROVE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Dr Stephen Humphris Trustee 15 November 2023
None on record
Christine Rachel Andrews Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
John Goacher Trustee 11 September 2023
None on record
Margaret Ann Tate Trustee 11 September 2023
None on record
Paul Howard Metcalfe Trustee 13 March 2023
None on record
Rev MICHELLE SARAH ONYETT Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
MICHELLE ROCK Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
CAROL SIMPSON Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
CATHERINE ANN BAILEY Trustee 15 March 2022
HORSFORTH GROVE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
JEAN MARION GOSLING Trustee 13 September 2021
None on record
Dr Robert Moore Trustee 11 March 2021
None on record
Guy Austin-Bride Trustee 01 December 2020
INTERACT CHURCH AND COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Rev Peter Brazier Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Rev Rachel Ward Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Dr John Uren Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record
Dorothy Stefanidis Trustee 12 March 2019
None on record
Sophie Lockwood Trustee 12 March 2019
None on record
Rev Peter Reasbeck Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
EMMANUEL OIKELOME BA Trustee 27 June 2018
GALILEAN TRUST
Received: On time
BRAIN LAWRENCE DRAPER Trustee 15 May 2018
None on record
ELIZABETH MARY BEETHAM Trustee 01 September 2017
COOKRIDGE VILLAGE SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
JACQUELINE HILLYARD Trustee 06 June 2016
None on record
ELIZABETH SMITH Trustee 01 September 2015
LEEDS SANCTUARY
Recently registered
KIRSTEEN VALENTINE BUTLER Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
ELLEN CAROL NORMANTON Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
LINDA MARGARET KELLETT Trustee 01 September 2015
STANNINGLEY EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN MARTIN PROCTER Trustee 01 September 2015
STANNINGLEY EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
LINDA ANNE STOREY Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
PHILIP MAUD BA Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
SUSAN HOGARTH CERT ED Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
BRIAN THORNTON Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
FRANCES ANN WOOD Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
ROY SHEARD Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
PAULINE PEACOCK Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
MARGARET ANNE METCALFE Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Rev KEITH WILLIAM HUNT Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
stuart westerman Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
DAVID JOHN WOOD Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
VICTORIA HAZEL ROSE Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
ALISON ERICA HARTLEY Trustee 23 July 2015
None on record
VERA ANNE JACKSON Trustee 22 July 2015
None on record
AUDREY WILKS Trustee 22 July 2015
None on record
Professor Gordon Edward Andrews Trustee 03 July 2014
None on record
Andrea Evers Trustee 02 July 2014
None on record
Rev Madeleine Elizabeth Andrews Trustee 26 September 2012
COTTINGLEY COMMUNITY PROJECT
Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days
LEEDS SANCTUARY
Recently registered
HELEN CATHERINE BOOCOCK Trustee 14 September 2012
BRADFORD SOUTH METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JANET TAYLOR Trustee 26 September 2011
None on record
PETER MARTIN CORDWELL Trustee
None on record
GLYNIS CLARKE Trustee
None on record
SHARON LESLIE BROCKSOM BA Trustee
None on record
FRED JEWITT Trustee
None on record
AIDAN JEWITT Trustee
HEARTBEAT OF SPORT LIMITED
Charity reporting is overdue by 1709 days
SIMON PETER BROCKSOM A.I.L.C Trustee
None on record
KEITH HARRISON Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR EDMUND HAROLD LINFIELD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £437.24k £431.03k £632.42k £1.56m £501.64k
Total expenditure £489.70k £521.57k £607.18k £560.74k £672.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £1.49k £343 £175
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £10.47k £0 £22.50k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £435.72k £1.55m £452.98k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £4.79k £17.97k £26.00k
Income - Other N/A N/A £179.97k £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £607.18k £560.74k £672.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £6.78k £19.25k £38.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £44.98k £76.00k £42.99k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A £2.25m £3.15m £2.99m
Long-term investments N/A N/A £103.13k £341.95k £242.49k
Other assets N/A N/A £580.59k £460.98k £698.02k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £152.52k £173.31k £204.21k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 23 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 September 2024 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 September 2024 89 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wesley Road Chapel
Wesley Road
LEEDS
LS12 1UL
Phone:
0113 2794816