Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MARKET HARBOROUGH HOSPITALS

Charity number: 500121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.69k £483 £52.23k £1.15k £1.62k
Total expenditure £3.29k £6.09k £2.63k £21.35k £2.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A