Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WOODFORD WELLS

Charity number: 1128042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Otis Edward Griffin Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Hannah Weldon Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Karen Watling Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Nersen Pillay Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Matt Jackson Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Rev Marcus Giddy Trustee 12 September 2022
None on record
SHEILA JEANETTE OAKES Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Dr Mary Nunns Trustee 14 June 2021
None on record
NICHOLAS JOHN GRAY Trustee 18 April 2021
THE VENTURERS NORFOLK BROADS CRUISE
Received: On time
Daniel Vickers Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Rev Mark Castleton Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Terence Newton Stamp Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Paul Victor Sherrington Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
Stella Margaret Redburn BEd ALCM Trustee 26 April 2015
None on record
Josephine Winifred Smith Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record
GILLIAN WENDY HAMPTON Trustee 23 May 2013
GROWING HOPE REDBRIDGE
Recently registered
HEATHER HOUSDEN Trustee 12 March 2012
None on record
Frank Hawkins Trustee 18 May 2011
None on record
ANNE MARIE SACHS Trustee 18 May 2011
None on record
REVEREND PAUL GEORGE HARCOURT MA Trustee
ALL SAINTS CENTENARY TRUST FUND
Received: On time
KINGDOM POWER TRUST
Received: On time