THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD WITH HOLY TRINITY, EXETER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parish Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 13 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST LEONARD'S PCC, EXETER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Douglas | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Michael Joseph Morrissey | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Steele | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Martin King | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Joshua Manning | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Michelle Alsop | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Matthew Bate | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tim Hamilton | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sharon Gardner | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Adrian Midmer | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
THOMAS RICHARDS | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Alfredda Anne Heather Lake | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|||||||
ALAN JOHN SAVAGE | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Rev CHRIS KEANE | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||
DR FRANCIS HUGH SANSBURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £473.60k | £466.34k | £507.55k | £504.38k | £440.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £517.71k | £447.29k | £433.47k | £464.91k | £417.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £453.15k | £429.17k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £45.36k | £5.96k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £16.58k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £9.05k | £52.67k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £957 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £433.47k | £464.91k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. LEONARDS CHURCH
TOPSHAM ROAD
EXETER
EX2 4NG
- Phone:
- 01392286991
- Email:
- office@stleonards.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window