THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WESTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £13,767 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 03 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS WESTON PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Ellis | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Catherine Wise | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Reed | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ravindra Roberts | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janine Willson | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jim Dwelly | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Rugg | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ERIC ALLENBY ALASTAIR CRAIG | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON CRUTHERS | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|||||
GORDON WRATTEN | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
KAREN BOWLES | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.29k | £124.16k | £98.42k | £98.42k | £131.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.31k | £116.70k | £106.67k | £106.67k | £140.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.14k | N/A | £3.53k | N/A | £13.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
Chestnut Avenue
ESHER
Surrey
KT10 8JL
- Phone:
- 0208 398 1849
- Email:
- office@allsaintsweston.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window