THE GEORGE O'BRIEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
George's Trust was formed with youth very much in mind. George was a special young man and his two main loves were music and sport . The Trust supports the Teenage Cancer Ward and Research in Southampton University Hospital. Provides small grants to youth projects and the Romsey Abbey Choir in the Romsey & Winchester area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 January 2009: Standard registration
- GEORGE'S TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE O'BRIEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN ROBERT HUTCHINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINA JOAN HUTCHINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LOUISE JENNIFER NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS RILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
Sarah Riley | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.40k | £4.69k | £8.09k | £12.12k | £18.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.47k | £17.36k | £16.75k | £3.71k | £3.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 01 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF CHORAL SCHOLARSHIPS, EQUIPMENT AND COACHING FOR MEMBERS OF THE ROMSEY ABBEY CHOIR UP TO THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN IN ORDER TO DEVELOP THEIR VOICES TO MATURITY. 2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF TEENAGERS AND YOUNG ADULTS SUFFERING FROM CANCER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. B) SUPPORTING RESEARC INTO DIAGNOSIS, CONTROL AND TREATMENT OF CANCER IN TEENAGERS AND YOUNG ADULTS. C) SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT AND PROVISION OF RESOURCE CENTRES FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF CANCER IN TEENAGERS AND YOUNG ADULTS. 3. TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO YOUTH ORGANISATIONS WITHIN THE WINCHESTER & ROMSEY AREA.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grayling House
Green Hill View
ROMSEY
SO51 8HE
- Phone:
- 01794501991
- Email:
- info@georgestrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window