WESLEY METHODIST CHURCH READING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an active congregation of 140 members from a wide range of backgrounds. On Sunday mornings and evenings we meet for worship. We have a thriving Junior Church, with ages from 0 to 18, and share with other East Reading churches in joint youth activities. Small groups for fellowship, Bible study, prayer and church life development meet regularly,and social action projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
76 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Reading
Governance
- 08 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- WESLEY READING (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Martin Pieter Beukes | Chair | 29 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Vishal Singh | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Bethany Johanne Finnegan | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Victoria Amoah-Fordjour | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Tirivashe Manhera | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Evelyn Asiedu Coffie | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Chris Emmanuel Neeraj Preetham | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anita Barbara Abbey-Quaye | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Kenneth Fordjour | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Julie Marsh | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Jonathan Frank | Trustee | 03 October 2014 |
|
|||||||
Terence John Rowell | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ANGELA DIANE MARJORAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Patricia Brown | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RICHARD GEORGE LANGFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DR STEPHEN APPIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Anna Ghelli | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Jonathan Howard Brown | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MARY ANN RUTH LUDLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ALAN DAVID LANGFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.63k | £111.24k | £116.86k | £129.87k | £94.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.40k | £130.28k | £113.96k | £116.23k | £114.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 August 2020 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 August 2020 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESLEY METHODIST CHURCH
84 QUEENS ROAD
READING
RG1 4BW
- Phone:
- 01189581505
- Email:
- info@wesleychurchreading.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window