THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE'S, WEST HOLLOWAY, LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups, events and meetings. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 01 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. LUKE'S PCC, WEST HOLLOWAY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Adlington | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Sheena Aluinn O'Regan Cruse | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Henry Humm | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Charlotte Holland | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tara Willson | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Rhian Helen Roberts | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Maria Cagnoni | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Ann Humm | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Barnaby Ward | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Curran | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Daniel Arthur Northam-Jones | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Christian | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Martin Daniel Edward Wroe | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Frances Sheldon | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOY PATRICIA HINSON PHD | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.17k | £176.70k | £164.88k | £233.27k | £392.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.83k | £151.65k | £186.66k | £260.50k | £386.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes Church
Hillmarton Road
LONDON
N7 9JE
- Phone:
- 020 7607 4892
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window