SOLIHULL METHODIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1127682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Public acts of worship open to members of the church and non-members. The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses & groups. Pastoral work including visiting the sick & bereaved. The provision of meetings with a Christian ethos for all ages. Making the premises available to outside organisations & establishing Christian contact wherever possible. Supporting charities in the UK & overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £324,219
Total expenditure: £334,073

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Solihull

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

44 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Molly Chitokwindo MA Chair 01 September 2021
None on record
Karen Jane Handford Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Ian Russell Hancock Trustee 28 April 2024
SOLIHULL YOUNG MUSICIANS SUPPORT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Yan Yeung Trustee 28 April 2024
BIRMINGHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Peter Anthony Farndon Trustee 28 April 2024
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR GENETIC MEDICINE
Received: On time
Christine Mary Burr Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Jacqueline Patricia Lancaster Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Adeyimka Gbadebo Trustee 30 July 2023
None on record
Abigail Rose Godfree Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
Roger Wellings Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
Deborah Margaret Install Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
Alison Faulkner Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
Lawrence James Day Trustee 06 February 2023
None on record
Rev Cleopas Sibanda Trustee 01 September 2022
BIRMINGHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE CHURCH AT CARRS LANE
Received: On time
METHODISTS FOR WORLD MISSION
Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
NORTHFIELD METHODIST CHURCH
Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days
Rev Farai Mapamula Trustee 01 September 2022
BIRMINGHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Glen Mullineux MAMScDPhil Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Jayne Pickles BEd Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Richard George Burr BSc Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Sian Louise Musgreave-Spiby BA Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Graham Stuart Mackenzie Trustee 07 May 2022
None on record
Caroline Elizabeth Hinchliffe Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
Peter James Austin Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
Karen Jayne Robertson Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
Catherine Coleman BA Hons Trustee 10 June 2019
None on record
SUSAN KATHRYN KELLY Trustee 10 June 2018
None on record
Alan Faulkner B.Phil Ed. Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
FIONA MARY BEADLE Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
Derek Richard Giles Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
JANE GARNETT BSC PGCE Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
Jonathan Tuckey Trustee 01 February 2017
None on record
Diane Webb Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
JUDITH ANN LINGARD Trustee 14 October 2014
None on record
CHRISTOPHER TUCKER Trustee 21 October 2013
None on record
ANDREW DAVID HUNT Trustee 21 October 2013
None on record
HELEN JUDITH BANKS Trustee 31 May 2012
None on record
PAMELA MARY BEATTIE Trustee 31 May 2012
None on record
Rev CHRISTINE GILES Trustee 20 February 2012
None on record
MRS JENNI KITSON Trustee 25 January 2012
EDUCAID AFRICA
Received: On time
JUDITH FARNDON Trustee
None on record
MARJORIE ANNE ROPER Trustee
None on record
ANN MARGARET POLSON Trustee
None on record
CHRISTINE LAURA COOKE Trustee
None on record
MARGERY BENSON Trustee
None on record
DAVID ALASTAIR GREY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £496.79k £219.36k £258.10k £301.08k £324.22k
Total expenditure £254.33k £214.00k £248.74k £294.59k £334.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 24 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 12 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SOLIHULL METHODIST CHURCH
BLOSSOMFIELD ROAD
SOLIHULL
B91 1LG
Phone:
01217057367