THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, AMERSHAM

Charity number: 1129139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £167,065
Total expenditure: £182,860

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Olsen Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Katherine Hyde Trustee 04 November 2023
None on record
Neil Lynch Trustee 28 June 2023
None on record
Andrew Connor Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Rosemary Marciniak Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Hazel Gwendolyn Miller Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Rachel Hill Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
Cathy Franklin Trustee 29 May 2018
None on record
RACHEL WILCOX Trustee 30 April 2017
THE BRITISH IRIS SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE CHILDREN'S CANCER AND LEUKAEMIA GROUP
Received: On time
Rev Debbie Oades Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Roland Gillott Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Peter Binns Trustee
None on record
Roger Leslie Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £160.85k £154.64k £114.50k £187.32k £167.07k
Total expenditure £176.38k £144.02k £139.38k £197.47k £182.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.00k £3.46k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
70 Sycamore Road
Amersham
HP6 5DR
Phone:
01494 726680