THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEMBDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities in and outreach in to the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 11 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. GEORGE'S WEMBDON PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dr CHRISTOPHER DAVID EDWARD MOLL | Chair |
|
||||||
Sally Louise Ackroyd | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clive Smallwood | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Casey | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN CANN | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JONATHON HODGE | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Keith Richard Ballard | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Douglass | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN POW | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE MICHAEL ACKROYD | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM RICHARD POW | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL PARSONS | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE ELLEN DEMPSEY | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE MAUDE CANNELL | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE BRINICOMBE HURST | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Peter Taylor | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.03k | £162.22k | £172.72k | £206.36k | £231.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.31k | £171.24k | £165.81k | £220.26k | £233.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.52k | £3.90k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St George's Church Vicarage
12 Greenacre
Wembdon
BRIDGWATER
Somerset
TA6 7RR
- Phone:
- 01278423468
- Email:
- office@sgw.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window