The Parochial Church Council of the Parish of Reading Gateway

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Promoting Christiantity through the staging of events, meetings and the distribution of literature. Promoting the whole mission of the church through the provision of activities for all. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
59 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Reading
- Wokingham
Governance
- 23 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC ST. AGNES WITH ST. PAUL AND ST. BARNABAS, READING (Working name)
- Reading Gateway Church (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. AGNES WITH ST. PAUL AND ST. BARNABAS, READING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicholas John Hill | Chair | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Ashby | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Anders | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Letsu | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Graham Critchley | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Winter | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hodgson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Bettes | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Carol Atkins | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER HORNE | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Simon Louis Vaney | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Caroline Vaney | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Josephine Simmons | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Morrey | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Winter | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Gash | Trustee | 06 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOAN WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAT NASH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.36k | £129.93k | £231.44k | £236.52k | £380.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.80k | £125.11k | £287.38k | £232.98k | £419.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £12.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £16.08k | £10.65k | £27.50k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 January 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 January 2024 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 01 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Reading Gateway Church
292 Northumberland Avenue
READING
RG2 8DE
- Phone:
- 0118 987 4448
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window