THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NEWBURY ST NICOLAS

Charity Number: 1128145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide regular public worship open to all; To provide sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation; To provide pastoral support for the sick, infirm and bereaved; To teach Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups; To provide Christian support and education for young people; To provide activities for people of all ages; To support other charities in the UK and overseas

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST NICOLAS, NEWBURY, PCC (Working name)
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICOLAS, NEWBURY WITH ST MARY, SPEENHAMLAND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV WILL HUNTER SMART Chair 05 June 2011
THE MAJENDIE CHARITY FOR THE POOR OF SPEEN
Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Rev Simon James Eves Trustee 28 September 2024
None on record
Joyce Margaret Zealey Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Ian Peter Gore Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Paul Lazarus Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Madeline Norman Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Graham Caskie Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Paul Mathew Philip Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Rosie Davis Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Tristan Rory Lloyd Davies Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Richard John Walker Coward Trustee 25 November 2020
COUNT EVERYONE IN
Received: On time
Rev Janice Macdonald Trustee 10 October 2019
None on record
Christine Vivien Philip Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record
PHILIP STEPHEN JAMES DAVIS Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Andrew Laidler Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Rev JOY MARIA MAWDESLEY Trustee 09 July 2016
None on record
JONATHAN EDWARD SOUTH Trustee 27 April 2016
None on record
SHARON JOY COWARD Trustee 09 September 2013
None on record
VIVIEN GRACE STAUNTON Trustee 03 May 2012
FRIENDS OF HOPE FOR AFRICA MISSIONS
Received: On time
NIGEL CRISPIAN FREEMAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £464.94k £459.03k £480.68k £518.12k £502.13k
Total expenditure £510.55k £463.33k £451.95k £463.99k £550.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.04k £1.63k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £453.97k £404.04k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £29.30k £37.17k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £28.61k £52.52k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £3.73k £8.39k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £2.50k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £71.63k £9.80k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £452.35k £529.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £11.64k £20.36k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £5.75k £6.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £36.24k £56.94k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £449.90k £433.26k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £575.62k £567.16k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £23.80k £46.80k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 February 2024 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 February 2024 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Nicolas Church Office
West Mills
NEWBURY
RG14 5HG
Phone:
0163547018